NY S06173 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-29 - SIGNED CHAP.174
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-29 - SIGNED CHAP.174
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the moratorium on the issuance of certificates of environmental safety for the siting of facilities and certification of routes for the transportation of liquefied natural or petroleum gas.
Title
Extends the moratorium on the issuance of certificates of environmental safety for the siting of facilities and certification of routes for the transportation of liquefied natural or petroleum gas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 112 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-29 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.174 |
2021-06-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.270 |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | substituted for a6910 |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2021-05-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-05-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-05-12 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.982 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A06910 (Same As) 2021-05-19 - substituted by s6173