NY S06158 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-16 - signed chap.663
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-16 - signed chap.663
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to notification of rights of victims of domestic violence in criminal and family court proceedings.
Title
Relates to notification of rights of victims of domestic violence in criminal and family court proceedings.
Sponsors
Sen. John Liu [D] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-16 | Senate | signed chap.663 |
2019-12-10 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.950 |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6158 |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-05-14 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-05-14 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-09 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.315 |
2019-05-07 | Senate | reported |
2019-05-07 | Senate | reported referred to codes |
2019-05-01 | Senate | referred to judiciary |
2019-06-05 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7395 |
2019-06-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.950 |
2019-05-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
Same As/Similar To
A07395 (Same As) 2019-12-16 - signed chap.663