NY S06157 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on December 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-18 - VETOED MEMO.245
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-18 - VETOED MEMO.245
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the central pine barrens area and the core preservation area; adds metes and bounds descriptions for property additions to the central pine barrens area and core preservation area.
Title
Relates to the central pine barrens area and the core preservation area; adds metes and bounds descriptions for property additions to the central pine barrens area and core preservation area.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-18 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.245 |
2017-12-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.567 |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a7722b |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2017-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1913 |
2017-06-12 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6157B |
2017-06-12 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2017-06-07 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-05-18 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6157A |
2017-05-18 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2017-05-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07722 (Same As) 2017-06-19 - substituted by s6157b