NY S06152 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-14 - PRINT NUMBER 6152A
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-14 - PRINT NUMBER 6152A
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the imposition of a sentence of life imprisonment without parole for defendants convicted of certain sex offenses against a child or mentally disabled person.
Title
Provides for the imposition of a sentence of life imprisonment without parole for defendants convicted of certain sex offenses against a child or mentally disabled person.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6152A |
2018-02-14 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CODES |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2017-05-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A08442 (Same As) 2018-02-15 - print number 8442a