NY S06145 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Eliminates the installation or covering of mercury-containing flooring in elementary and secondary schools.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Eliminates the installation or covering of mercury-containing flooring in elementary and secondary schools.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-19Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-06-19Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-19Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.468
2019-06-19Assemblysubstituted for a7986
2019-06-12Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2019-06-12SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-12SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-04SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-06-03Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-05-30Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1028
2019-05-17SenateREFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION

Same As/Similar To

A07986 (Same As) 2019-06-19 - substituted by s6145

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback