NY S06136 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-05 - PRINT NUMBER 6136B
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-05 - PRINT NUMBER 6136B
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the department of state to conduct a study on the use of legal material in an electronic format that guarantees the authenticity of and access to such legal materials.
Title
Directs the department of state to conduct a study on the use of legal material in an electronic format that guarantees the authenticity of and access to such legal materials.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6136B |
2018-06-05 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2017-05-26 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6136A |
2017-05-26 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2017-05-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A01922 (Same As) 2018-06-12 - REFERRED TO RULES