NY S06134 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on December 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-17 - VETOED MEMO.183
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-17 - VETOED MEMO.183
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the maximum award available under the historic preservation tax credit from five million dollars to twelve million dollars.
Title
Increases the maximum award available under the historic preservation tax credit from five million dollars to twelve million dollars.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Grisanti [R] | Sen. Timothy Kennedy [D] | Sen. Suzi Oppenheimer [D] | Sen. Michael Ranzenhofer [R] |
Sen. David Valesky [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-17 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.183 |
2012-12-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.350 |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a9110 |
2012-06-12 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2012-06-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-06-12 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1170 |
2012-06-12 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2012-05-02 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A09110 (Same As) 2012-06-19 - substituted by s6134