NY S06122 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to requiring building condition surveys to be conducted on public school buildings constructed prior to 1950 every other year and a visual inspection in alternate years.
Title
Relates to requiring building condition surveys to be conducted on public school buildings constructed prior to 1950 every other year and a visual inspection in alternate years.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2017-05-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A06895 (Same As) 2018-04-10 - enacting clause stricken
A10577 (Same As) 2018-05-07 - referred to education
A10577 (Same As) 2018-05-07 - referred to education