NY S06117 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-01 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-01 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the length of the term of office of members of the legislature to four years; imposes term limits for members of the legislature.
Title
Increases the length of the term of office of members of the legislature to four years; imposes term limits for members of the legislature.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-01 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2022-01-28 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2021-05-19 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2021-04-26 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2021-04-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |