NY S06113 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-04 - referred to cities
Pending: Assembly Cities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits certain surcharges on certain credit or debit card transactions in the city of New York.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits certain surcharges on certain credit or debit card transactions in the city of New York.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate Cities Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Cities Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-04Assemblyreferred to cities
2018-06-04SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-04SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-02-06SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2018-02-05Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2018-01-30Senate1ST REPORT CAL.328
2018-01-03SenateREFERRED TO CITIES
2018-01-03Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-01-03Assemblydied in assembly
2017-06-19Assemblyreferred to cities
2017-06-19SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-06-19SenatePASSED SENATE
2017-06-19SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1911
2017-06-06SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2017-05-11SenateREFERRED TO CITIES

Same As/Similar To

A08043 (Same As) 2017-09-27 - enacting clause stricken
A09755 (Same As) 2018-02-05 - referred to cities

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback