NY S06113 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-17 - APPROVAL MEMO.8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Legalizes the dissolution of the office of fire commissioners by the town of Deposit.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Legalizes the dissolution of the office of fire commissioners by the town of Deposit.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-03-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-08-17AssemblyAPPROVAL MEMO.8
2012-08-17AssemblySIGNED CHAP.413
2012-08-06SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2012-06-14Assemblyreturned to senate
2012-06-14Assemblypassed assembly
2012-06-14Assemblyhome rule request
2012-06-14Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.157
2012-06-14Assemblysubstituted for a8559a
2012-06-12Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2012-06-12AssemblyRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-06-12SenateREPASSED SENATE
2012-06-12SenateHOME RULE REQUEST
2012-04-25SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 6113A
2012-04-25SenateVOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING
2012-04-25Senatereturned to senate
2012-04-25AssemblyRECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY
2012-03-05Assemblyreferred to local governments
2012-03-05SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-03-05SenatePASSED SENATE
2012-03-05SenateHOME RULE REQUEST
2012-01-30SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2012-01-24Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2012-01-23Senate1ST REPORT CAL.92
2012-01-04SenateREFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Same As/Similar To

A08559 (Same As) 2012-06-14 - substituted by s6113a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback