NY S06111 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE
Pending: Senate Budget and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE
Pending: Senate Budget and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the rescued animals spay and neuter fund; authorizes the department of taxation and finance to place a check-off box on income tax returns for taxpayers to contribute money to the fund.
Title
Creates the rescued animals spay and neuter fund; authorizes the department of taxation and finance to place a check-off box on income tax returns for taxpayers to contribute money to the fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Budget and Revenue Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
2021-05-19 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2021-04-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |