NY S06098 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to promotions of detectives; grants detectives of the third grade and detectives of the second grade the same rights in respect to the police pension fund as detectives of a grade higher after a certain period of time.
Title
Relates to promotions of detectives; grants detectives of the third grade and detectives of the second grade the same rights in respect to the police pension fund as detectives of a grade higher after a certain period of time.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-05-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.978 |
2018-02-16 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6098B |
2018-02-16 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CITIES |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES |
2017-05-17 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6098A |
2017-05-17 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CITIES |
2017-05-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A07735 (Same As) 2018-02-21 - print number 7735a