NY S06094 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases penalties for endangerment of a highway worker, promotes work zone safety awareness, and establishes a fund for additional work zone safety enforcement.
Title
Increases penalties for endangerment of a highway worker, promotes work zone safety awareness, and establishes a fund for additional work zone safety enforcement.
Sponsors
Sen. Timothy Kennedy [D] | Sen. Philip Boyle [R] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. James Gaughran [D] |
Sen. Todd Kaminsky [D] | Sen. Jen Metzger [D] | Sen. James Skoufis [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2020-03-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-03-03 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-02-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-02-27 | Senate | AMENDED 6094A |
2020-02-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.500 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2019-05-30 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A08208 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to transportation