NY S06093 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-16 - VETOED MEMO.123
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-16 - VETOED MEMO.123
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the effect and rebuttal of certain medical presumptions relating to heart disease; provides that, for certain members, any condition of impairment of health caused by a disease of the heart, resulting in disability, shall be presumptive evidence that such disability was incurred in the performance and discharge of duty and the natural and proximate result of an accident.
Title
Relates to the effect and rebuttal of certain medical presumptions relating to heart disease; provides that, for certain members, any condition of impairment of health caused by a disease of the heart, resulting in disability, shall be presumptive evidence that such disability was incurred in the performance and discharge of duty and the natural and proximate result of an accident.
Sponsors
Sen. Andrew Gounardes [D] | Sen. Joseph Addabbo [D] | Sen. John Brooks [D] | Sen. James Gaughran [D] |
Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. Shelley Mayer [D] | Sen. Sean Ryan [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-16 | Senate | VETOED MEMO.123 |
2022-12-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.609 |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | substituted for a7004a |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2022-06-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-06-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-06-01 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1757 |
2022-06-01 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-02-08 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6093A |
2022-02-08 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2021-04-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07004 (Same As) 2022-06-02 - substituted by s6093a