NY S06086 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 28 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3302
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Increases the number of members of the public health and health planning council from 25 to 26; requires that a representative of freestanding ambulatory surgery centers be selected as a member of the public health and health planning council.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increases the number of members of the public health and health planning council from 25 to 26; requires that a representative of freestanding ambulatory surgery centers be selected as a member of the public health and health planning council.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-18SenateSUBSTITUTED BY A3302
2023-05-15SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2023-05-10Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2023-05-09Senate1ST REPORT CAL.857
2023-03-28SenateREFERRED TO HEALTH

Same As/Similar To

A03302 (Same As) 2023-10-25 - signed chap.547

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback