NY S06086 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on November 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-03 - NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-03 - NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to purchasing restrictions on persons boycotting Israel and the investment of certain public funds in companies boycotting Israel; requires the commissioner of general services to compile a list of companies boycotting Israel and establishes that such companies will be considered non-responsive bidders.
Title
Relates to purchasing restrictions on persons boycotting Israel and the investment of certain public funds in companies boycotting Israel; requires the commissioner of general services to compile a list of companies boycotting Israel and establishes that such companies will be considered non-responsive bidders.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-03 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2015-11-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08220 (Same As) 2016-03-29 - print number 8220a