NY S06076 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes maximum nicotine levels for electronic cigarettes and e-liquids manufactured in this state; defines "e-liquids".
Title
Establishes maximum nicotine levels for electronic cigarettes and e-liquids manufactured in this state; defines "e-liquids".
Sponsors
Sen. John Brooks [D] | Sen. Fred Akshar [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2019-06-20 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1519 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A08105 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to health