NY S06073 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 16 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Regulates the online sale of vaping products and requires proof of identification to show a purchaser is over the age of twenty-one.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regulates the online sale of vaping products and requires proof of identification to show a purchaser is over the age of twenty-one.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20SenateRECOMMITTED TO RULES
2019-06-18SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1518
2019-06-18SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2019-05-16SenateREFERRED TO HEALTH

Same As/Similar To

A08631 (Same As) 2019-10-02 - referred to health

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback