NY S06064 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-29 - SIGNED CHAP.368
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-29 - SIGNED CHAP.368
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates that portion of state route 208 in the village of Washingtonville, Orange county, as "John Spear Way".
Title
Designates that portion of state route 208 in the village of Washingtonville, Orange county, as "John Spear Way".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-29 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.368 |
2016-09-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.796 |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | substituted for a8549 |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2016-06-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-05-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-05-18 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-05-17 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.901 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2015-10-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08549 (Same As) 2016-06-02 - substituted by s6064