NY S06046 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-01 - SIGNED CHAP.219
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-01 - SIGNED CHAP.219
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the town of New Castle, county of Westchester, to alienate and discontinue the use of certain parklands and to dedicate certain other lands conveyed to the town from Vivek and Chitra Agastya as parklands.
Title
Authorizes the town of New Castle, county of Westchester, to alienate and discontinue the use of certain parklands and to dedicate certain other lands conveyed to the town from Vivek and Chitra Agastya as parklands.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-01 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.219 |
2021-06-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | home rule request |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.134 |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | substituted for a7033a |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2021-05-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-05-24 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-05-24 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2021-05-12 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.954 |
2021-05-03 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6046B |
2021-05-03 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2021-04-26 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6046A |
2021-04-26 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2021-03-31 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A07033 (Same As) 2021-05-25 - substituted by s6046b