NY S06046 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-4)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-15 - PRINT NUMBER 6046C
Pending: Senate Cities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-15 - PRINT NUMBER 6046C
Pending: Senate Cities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Reduces the limitations on the number of schools at which photo speed violation monitoring systems may be utilized and the times during which they may be operated; requires such city to install signs giving notice of the use of such a system; and extends the expiration of such program until July 1, 2022.
Title
Reduces the limitations on the number of schools at which photo speed violation monitoring systems may be utilized and the times during which they may be operated; requires such city to install signs giving notice of the use of such a system; and extends the expiration of such program until July 1, 2022.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6046C |
2018-05-15 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CITIES |
2018-04-20 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO CITIES |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2017-06-13 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6046B |
2017-06-13 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2017-06-12 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6046A |
2017-06-12 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2017-05-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07798 (Same As) 2018-06-18 - REFERRED TO RULES