NY S06038 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-01 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-01 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to enhancing sentencing of repeat felons.
Title
Relates to enhancing sentencing of repeat felons.
Sponsors
Sen. Rich Funke [R] | Sen. Philip Boyle [R] | Sen. Thomas Croci [R] | Sen. John DeFrancisco [R] |
Sen. Patrick Gallivan [R] | Sen. Pamela Helming [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-01 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2018-05-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-05-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-03-19 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-03-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.653 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2017-06-07 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-05-18 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6038A |
2017-05-18 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2017-05-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |