NY S06036 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-16 - PRINT NUMBER 6036A
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-16 - PRINT NUMBER 6036A
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires all elementary and secondary schools and boards of cooperative educational services to establish school meal charge policies in order to ensure a consistent and transparent approach is applied in instances of unpaid meal charges and the collection of delinquent debt.
Title
Requires all elementary and secondary schools and boards of cooperative educational services to establish school meal charge policies in order to ensure a consistent and transparent approach is applied in instances of unpaid meal charges and the collection of delinquent debt.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-16 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6036A |
2018-02-16 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2017-05-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A09995 (Same As) 2018-03-07 - referred to education