NY S06034 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on August 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4106
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on August 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4106
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Includes the examination of tinted or shaded windows in the periodic inspection of motor vehicles required by law; authorizes the commissioner of motor vehicles to promulgate any and all rules and regulations necessary.
Title
Includes the examination of tinted or shaded windows in the periodic inspection of motor vehicles required by law; authorizes the commissioner of motor vehicles to promulgate any and all rules and regulations necessary.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-16 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A4106 |
2016-06-08 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1556 |
2016-06-08 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-05-17 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6034A |
2016-05-17 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2015-08-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A04106 (Same As) 2016-11-28 - signed chap.444