NY S06031 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on August 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-02 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on August 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-02 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to therapy dogs and cats for persons with a disability.
Title
Relates to therapy dogs and cats for persons with a disability.
Sponsors
Sen. Timothy Kennedy [D] | Sen. Joseph Addabbo [D] | Sen. Philip Boyle [R] | Sen. Jesse Hamilton [D] |
Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] | Sen. Jose Peralta [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-02 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2015-08-24 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6031A |
2015-08-24 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2015-08-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08705 (Same As) 2016-01-13 - referred to governmental operations