NY S06028 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6877
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6877
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows insurers to dispense with or defer inspections of private passenger automobiles prior to the provision of coverage for physical damage thereto.
Title
Allows insurers to dispense with or defer inspections of private passenger automobiles prior to the provision of coverage for physical damage thereto.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A6877 |
2022-06-01 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1756 |
2022-06-01 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2021-03-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A06877 (Same As) 2022-11-23 - tabled