NY S06025 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - referred to real property taxation
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Designates state lands located within the boundaries of the Caumsett State Historic Park Preserve, in the county of Suffolk, to be subject to taxation for all purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designates state lands located within the boundaries of the Caumsett State Historic Park Preserve, in the county of Suffolk, to be subject to taxation for all purposes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-19Assemblyreferred to real property taxation
2019-06-18SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-18SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-18SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1579
2019-06-18SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2019-05-29SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2019-05-16SenateREFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback