NY S06019 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-21 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides for electronic court appearance in a criminal action, anywhere in the state, in the discretion of the court having jurisdiction of the defendant; provides that the defendant must, after consultation with counsel, consent on the record; provides that the chief administrator of the courts must first approve the use of such electronic appearance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for electronic court appearance in a criminal action, anywhere in the state, in the discretion of the court having jurisdiction of the defendant; provides that the defendant must, after consultation with counsel, consent on the record; provides that the chief administrator of the courts must first approve the use of such electronic appearance.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-06-21SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2012-05-21SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2012-05-16Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2012-05-15Senate1ST REPORT CAL.766
2012-01-04SenateREFERRED TO CODES

Same As/Similar To

A01904 (Same As) 2012-06-05 - held for consideration in codes

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback