NY S06014 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-10 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the New York task force on automated vehicle technology to study and assess the future of automated vehicle technology.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the New York task force on automated vehicle technology to study and assess the future of automated vehicle technology.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-10SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2020-02-05Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2020-02-04Senate1ST REPORT CAL.356
2020-01-15SenatePRINT NUMBER 6014B
2020-01-15SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION
2020-01-08SenateREFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
2020-01-08Assemblyreturned to senate
2020-01-08Assemblydied in assembly
2019-06-17Assemblyreferred to transportation
2019-06-17SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-17SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-13SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 6014A
2019-06-04SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-06-03Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-05-30Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1082
2019-05-16SenateREFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION

Same As/Similar To

A07980 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to transportation

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback