NY S06013 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - PRINT NUMBER 6013A
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - PRINT NUMBER 6013A
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the definition of person in parental relationship to a child; includes a person possessing a lawful order of custody of a child.
Title
Relates to the definition of person in parental relationship to a child; includes a person possessing a lawful order of custody of a child.
Sponsors
Sen. Tony Avella [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6013A |
2018-03-28 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2017-05-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A08094 (Same As) 2018-05-04 - reference changed to health