NY S06011 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-24 - PRINT NUMBER 6011A
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-24 - PRINT NUMBER 6011A
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to disability retirement for members of the department of environmental conservation, forest rangers, university police officers and the regional state park police.
Title
Relates to disability retirement for members of the department of environmental conservation, forest rangers, university police officers and the regional state park police.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-24 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6011A |
2022-01-24 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2021-03-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A06373 (Same As) 2022-01-26 - print number 6373a