NY S05999 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-16 - signed chap.171
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-16 - signed chap.171
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends chapter 219 of the laws of 2003 in relation to extending the provisions of such chapter.
Title
Amends chapter 219 of the laws of 2003 in relation to extending the provisions of such chapter.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-16 | Senate | signed chap.171 |
2019-08-05 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1043 |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5999 |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2019-05-29 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-05-29 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-09 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.312 |
2019-05-07 | Senate | reported |
2019-04-18 | Senate | referred to higher education |
2019-06-06 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7251 |
2019-06-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-06-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1043 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07251 (Same As) 2019-08-16 - signed chap.171
S05393 (Same As) 2019-04-29 - REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION
S05393 (Same As) 2019-04-29 - REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION