NY S05992 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-19 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to language development for deaf and hard of hearing children; requires the department to select language development milestones for existing standardized norms for purposes of developing a resource for use by parents to monitor and track deaf and hard of hearing children's expressive and receptive language acquisition and developmental stages toward English literacy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to language development for deaf and hard of hearing children; requires the department to select language development milestones for existing standardized norms for purposes of developing a resource for use by parents to monitor and track deaf and hard of hearing children's expressive and receptive language acquisition and developmental stages toward English literacy.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-19Assemblyreferred to education
2018-06-19SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-19SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-18SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1843
2018-06-18SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2018-06-12SenatePRINT NUMBER 5992B
2018-06-12SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION
2018-03-21SenatePRINT NUMBER 5992A
2018-03-21SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION
2018-01-03SenateREFERRED TO EDUCATION
2017-05-09SenateREFERRED TO EDUCATION

Same As/Similar To

A10710 (Same As) 2018-05-15 - referred to education

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback