NY S05981 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8215
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8215
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the collection of an incarceration fee.
Title
Relates to the collection of an incarceration fee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-24 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A8215 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-02-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-02-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.494 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | referred to correction |
2021-06-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-03 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-05-24 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1286 |
2021-05-24 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-04-27 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2021-03-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A08215 (Same As) 2022-12-23 - signed chap.753