NY S05971 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-08 - PRINT NUMBER 5971A
Pending: Senate Aging Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-08 - PRINT NUMBER 5971A
Pending: Senate Aging Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes application of the property tax abatement for rent-controlled or rent regulated properties occupied by senior citizens or disabled persons, to those units occupied by tenants paying the maximum allowable rent when such rent exceeds 1/2 of the household income; provides for state payments to cities affected thereby equal to 10% of lost real property tax revenue.
Title
Authorizes application of the property tax abatement for rent-controlled or rent regulated properties occupied by senior citizens or disabled persons, to those units occupied by tenants paying the maximum allowable rent when such rent exceeds 1/2 of the household income; provides for state payments to cities affected thereby equal to 10% of lost real property tax revenue.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-08 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5971A |
2016-02-08 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO AGING |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGING |
2015-06-25 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-06-17 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1763 |
2015-06-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |