NY S05970 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 16 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes James Unger, a town of West Seneca police officer, to receive certain credit under section 384-d of the retirement and social security law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes James Unger, a town of West Seneca police officer, to receive certain credit under section 384-d of the retirement and social security law.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-08SenateREFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
2019-12-09SenatePRINT NUMBER 5970B
2019-12-09SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
2019-09-13SenatePRINT NUMBER 5970A
2019-09-13SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
2019-05-16SenateREFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback