NY S05970 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: No history available
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: No history available
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to terms and conditions of employment for members of the collective bargaining unit consisting of commissioned and non-commissioned state police officers; relates to salary schedules for members of such unit; establishes an employee benefit fund for members of such unit and makes an appropriation therefor.
Title
Relates to terms and conditions of employment for members of the collective bargaining unit consisting of commissioned and non-commissioned state police officers; relates to salary schedules for members of such unit; establishes an employee benefit fund for members of such unit and makes an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-14 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.235 |
2015-08-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.605 |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a8246 |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2015-06-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-17 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1798 |
2015-06-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |