NY S05967 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies the definition of veteran to include career members of the armed forces for purposes of the veterans alternative tax exemption by considering individuals who meet certain conditions to have been discharged or released from active military, naval or air service despite the fact that no discharge may have been issued.
Title
Clarifies the definition of veteran to include career members of the armed forces for purposes of the veterans alternative tax exemption by considering individuals who meet certain conditions to have been discharged or released from active military, naval or air service despite the fact that no discharge may have been issued.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2023-05-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-05-24 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-05-22 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1109 |
2023-05-22 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2023-03-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
Same As/Similar To
A03381 (Same As) 2023-11-10 - signed chap.611