NY S05967 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-18 - SIGNED CHAP.466
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-18 - SIGNED CHAP.466
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of environmental conservation to report on deer management technique in urban and suburban areas.
Title
Requires the department of environmental conservation to report on deer management technique in urban and suburban areas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-18 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.466 |
2017-12-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.336 |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | substituted for a6818a |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-06-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-14 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1658 |
2017-06-09 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5967A |
2017-06-09 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2017-06-07 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-05-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A06818 (Same As) 2017-06-15 - substituted by s5967a