NY S05966 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-16 - SIGNED CHAP.80
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-16 - SIGNED CHAP.80
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to authorizing the secretary of state to order the cessation of unlicensed appearance enhancement activity and to register trainees in the practice of nail specialty.
Title
Relates to authorizing the secretary of state to order the cessation of unlicensed appearance enhancement activity and to register trainees in the practice of nail specialty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-16 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.80 |
2015-07-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2015-06-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2015-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.623 |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a7630a |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2015-06-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-17 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1796 |
2015-06-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A07630 (Same As) 2015-06-18 - substituted by s5966