NY S05964 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-25 - PRINT NUMBER 5964A
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-25 - PRINT NUMBER 5964A
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows a continuous service credit for retirement purposes for peace officers of the unified court system who were laid off for economy reasons in 1991 and returned to service in 1992.
Title
Allows a continuous service credit for retirement purposes for peace officers of the unified court system who were laid off for economy reasons in 1991 and returned to service in 1992.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-25 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5964A |
2022-01-25 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2021-03-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A06561 (Same As) 2022-01-12 - print number 6561a