NY S05963 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on June 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to reasonable accommodations for protected classes.
Title
Relates to reasonable accommodations for protected classes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2015-06-25 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1871 |
2015-06-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |