NY S05960 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates August thirty-first of each year as a day of commemoration to be known as "Overdose Awareness Day".
Title
Designates August thirty-first of each year as a day of commemoration to be known as "Overdose Awareness Day".
Sponsors
Sen. Elijah Reichlin-Melnick [D] | Sen. Philip Boyle [R] | Sen. Andrew Gounardes [D] | Sen. Peter Harckham [D] |
Sen. Daphne Jordan [R] | Sen. Susan Serino [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-10 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2022-05-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-01-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-01-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-01-19 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.265 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2021-06-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-04-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-04-27 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.793 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A07887 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to governmental operations