NY S05959 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 22 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-07-23 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the right of publicity and provides for a private right of action for unlawful dissemination or publication of a sexually explicit depiction of an individual.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the right of publicity and provides for a private right of action for unlawful dissemination or publication of a sexually explicit depiction of an individual.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-23Assemblyreturned to senate
2020-07-23Assemblypassed assembly
2020-07-23Assemblyordered to third reading cal.210
2020-07-23Assemblysubstituted for a5605c
2020-07-22Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2020-07-22SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2020-07-22SenatePASSED SENATE
2020-07-21SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.788
2020-07-21SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2020-07-17SenatePRINT NUMBER 5959D
2020-07-17SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE
2020-03-10SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2020-03-05SenatePRINT NUMBER 5959C
2020-03-05SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY
2020-01-08SenateREFERRED TO JUDICIARY
2019-06-16SenatePRINT NUMBER 5959B
2019-06-16SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY
2019-06-07SenatePRINT NUMBER 5959A
2019-06-07SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY
2019-05-17SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO JUDICIARY
2019-05-16SenateREFERRED TO CODES

Same As/Similar To

A05605 (Same As) 2020-07-23 - substituted by s5959d

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05959&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05959&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S05959
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05959&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S05959A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05959&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S05959B
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05959&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S05959C
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05959&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S05959D
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S5959#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S5959#SC2
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S5959#SF1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05959&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S5959#SC3

Bill Comments

feedback