NY S05958 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-23 - SIGNED CHAP.87
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-23 - SIGNED CHAP.87
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the conducting of a presidential primary; provides for the election of delegates to a national party convention or a national party conference in the year 2016 and the "presidential" and "fall" primary in such year; relates to electing delegates to a national party convention.
Title
Relates to the conducting of a presidential primary; provides for the election of delegates to a national party convention or a national party conference in the year 2016 and the "presidential" and "fall" primary in such year; relates to electing delegates to a national party convention.
Sponsors
Sen. Rich Funke [R] | Sen. Jack Martins [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-23 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.87 |
2015-07-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2015-06-24 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2015-06-24 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-24 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.740 |
2015-06-24 | Assembly | substituted for a8310 |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | referred to election law |
2015-06-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1870 |
2015-06-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08310 (Same As) 2015-06-24 - substituted by s5958