NY S05950 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-01 - SIGNED CHAP.217
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-01 - SIGNED CHAP.217
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the dormitory authority to provide financing to the Mary Cariola Children's Center, Inc. located in Rochester, New York.
Title
Authorizes the dormitory authority to provide financing to the Mary Cariola Children's Center, Inc. located in Rochester, New York.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-01 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.217 |
2021-06-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-05-04 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-05-04 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-05-04 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.239 |
2021-05-04 | Assembly | substituted for a1021 |
2021-04-27 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-04-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-04-27 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-04-26 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-04-21 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.699 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A01021 (Same As) 2021-05-04 - substituted by s5950