NY S05941 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-12-13 - SIGNED CHAP.728
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires businesses to notify consumers of an upcoming automatic renewal or continuous service charge to the consumer's account forty-five days prior to such charge; requires businesses to include instructions on how to cancel such renewal or charge in the notice to the consumer.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires businesses to notify consumers of an upcoming automatic renewal or continuous service charge to the consumer's account forty-five days prior to such charge; requires businesses to include instructions on how to cancel such renewal or charge in the notice to the consumer.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-12-13SenateSIGNED CHAP.728
2023-12-12SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2023-06-06Assemblyreturned to senate
2023-06-06Assemblypassed assembly
2023-06-06Assemblyordered to third reading cal.37
2023-06-06Assemblysubstituted for a3245d
2023-06-01Assemblyreferred to consumer affairs and protection
2023-06-01SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2023-06-01SenatePASSED SENATE
2023-05-31SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2023-05-30Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2023-05-24Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1356
2023-05-12SenatePRINT NUMBER 5941B
2023-05-12SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
2023-03-31SenatePRINT NUMBER 5941A
2023-03-31SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
2023-03-23SenateREFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION

Same As/Similar To

A03245 (Same As) 2023-06-06 - substituted by s5941b

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/S5941
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05941&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S05941
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05941&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S05941A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05941&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S05941B
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/S5941#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/S5941#SF1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05941&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback