NY S05940 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-04 - NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to capping the state budget at fifteen percent of total state gross domestic product for the prior calendar year, as determined by the state comptroller.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to capping the state budget at fifteen percent of total state gross domestic product for the prior calendar year, as determined by the state comptroller.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-04SenateNOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED
2024-01-29SenateOPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
2024-01-04SenateTO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION
2024-01-03SenateREFERRED TO JUDICIARY
2023-04-12SenateOPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
2023-03-24SenateTO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION
2023-03-23SenateREFERRED TO JUDICIARY

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback