NY S05939 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on March 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the development of any new major electric generating facilities that would be powered in whole or in part by any fossil fuel, unless the developer of such facility can demonstrate a need for such facility, and that there is no other reasonable method to satisfy such need.
Title
Prohibits the development of any new major electric generating facilities that would be powered in whole or in part by any fossil fuel, unless the developer of such facility can demonstrate a need for such facility, and that there is no other reasonable method to satisfy such need.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-01-18 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-01-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-01-11 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.121 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2021-05-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5939A |
2021-05-04 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2021-03-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A06761 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to energy